WV HB2405 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 250, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 250, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to impose a tiered tax on HMOs in a manner that will permit the maximization of federal matching dollars for use in the state Medicaid program.
Title
Imposing a healthcare related provider tax on certain health care organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 479) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 349) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 124) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 349) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 124) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 250, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 479) |
2019-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 349) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-13 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-13 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 124) |
2019-02-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-08 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-18 | House | To House Finance |
2019-01-18 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-15 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-15 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2019-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 26 | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 18 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 19 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 26 | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
11 | 27 | 10a | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 27 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |