WV HB2358 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 258, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 258, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the meaning of federal adjusted gross income and certain other terms used in the West Virginia Personal Income Tax Act; and specify effective dates.
Title
Updating meaning of federal adjusted gross income and certain other terms used in West Virginia Personal Income Tax Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 3) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 2) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 3) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 2) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 258, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/24/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-02-24 | House | Approved by Governor 2/24/21 |
2021-02-25 | House | Approved by Governor 2/24/21 - House Journal |
2021-02-23 | House | To Governor 2/23/21 |
2021-02-24 | House | To Governor 2/23/21 - House Journal |
2021-02-24 | Senate | To Governor 2/23/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-02-19 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 11) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 10) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-02-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-02-15 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) |
2021-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 3) |
2021-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-15 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 2) |
2021-02-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-02-15 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-02-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-12 | House | To Finance |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB276 (Similar To) 2021-02-13 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |