WV HB2240 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Vetoed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide that an act of domestic violence or a sexual offense by strangling is an aggravated felony offense.
Title
Providing that an act of domestic violence or sexual offense by strangling is an aggravated felony offense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 579) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 188) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 188) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-20 | House | To Governor 3/20/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/20/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 579) |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2015-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 188) |
2015-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-19 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-19 | House | By substitute, do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-01-23 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-23 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2015-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB396 (Similar To) 2015-02-03 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 2 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 2 | 9d | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 8B | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 8B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |