WV HB2164 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove provisions for using assumed assessed values for the purpose of computation of local share public school support. The bill removes provisions for increasing counties' local share responsibility for funding basic foundation education formula when property assessments are not at least fifty-four percent of market value as indicated by assessment ratio study; it revises definitions; and makes legislative findings with respect to the effect of under assessed property values on school funding and the obligations of assessors and Tax Commissioner.
Title
Relating to public school support computation of local share
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - House - Passage (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | On 2nd reading to Finance | |
2011-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-10 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-10 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance | |
2011-02-17 | To Education | |
2011-02-17 | To Education then Finance | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-17 | House Message received | |
2011-02-16 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Passed House (Roll No. 88) | |
2011-02-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-16 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-15 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-14 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-11 | Do pass | |
2011-01-25 | To House Finance | |
2011-01-25 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2011-01-12 | To House Education | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced in House | |
2011-01-12 | To Education then Finance | |
2011-01-12 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 1C | 5b | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 9A | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 11a | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 9A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 2a | (n/a) | See Bill Text |