WV HB216 | 2010 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - Chapter 4, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Supplementing and amending an item of existing appropriation from the State Fund, General Revenue, to the Governor's Office Civil Contingent Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplementing and amending an item of existing appropriation from the State Fund, General Revenue, to the Governor's Office Civil Contingent Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 525) (Y: 81 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 524) (Y: 76 N: 7 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-21 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 523) (Y: 60 N: 23 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 520) (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 519) (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-21 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 518) (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-30 Chapter 4, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2010
2010-07-21 Approved by Governor 7/26/10 - House Journal
2010-07-26 Approved by Governor 7/26/10
2010-07-21 Approved by Governor 7/26/10 - Senate Journal
2010-07-21 To Governor 7/26/10 - Senate Journal
2010-07-26 To Governor 7/26/10
2010-07-21 To Governor 7/26/10 - House Journal
2010-07-21 House Message received
2010-07-21 Completed legislative action
2010-07-21 Communicated to Senate
2010-07-21 Effective from passage (Roll No. 525)
2010-07-21 Passed House (Roll No. 524)
2010-07-21 House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 523)
2010-07-21 House received Senate message
2010-07-21 Senate requests House to concur
2010-07-21 Effective from passage (Roll No. 12)
2010-07-21 Passed Senate (Roll No. 12)
2010-07-21 Read 3rd time
2010-07-21 On 3rd reading
2010-07-21 Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2010-07-21 Read 2nd time
2010-07-21 Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 11)
2010-07-21 On 2nd reading
2010-07-21 Read 1st time
2010-07-21 On 1st reading
2010-07-21 Committee reference dispensed
2010-07-21 Immediate consideration
2010-07-21 Introduced in Senate
2010-07-21 Communicated to Senate
2010-07-21 Effective from passage (Roll No. 520)
2010-07-21 Passed House (Roll No. 519)
2010-07-21 Read 3rd time
2010-07-21 Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 518)
2010-07-21 Read 2nd time
2010-07-21 On 2nd reading, House Calendar
2010-07-20 Read 1st time
2010-07-20 Immediate consideration
2010-07-20 Do pass
2010-07-20 Originating in House Finance

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=216&year=2010&sessiontype=2X&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB216%20ENR.htm&yr=2010&sesstype=2X&i=216
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB216%20intr.htm&yr=2010&sesstype=2X&i=216
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2010/2X/votes/house/00518.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2010/2X/votes/house/00519.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2010/2X/votes/house/00520.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2010/2X/votes/house/00523.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2010/2X/votes/house/00524.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2010/2X/votes/house/00525.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback