WV HB215 | 2010 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - Chapter 3, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Supplemental appropriation to Education and the Arts, Environmental Protection and Insurance Commissioner

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental appropriation to Education and the Arts, Environmental Protection and Insurance Commissioner

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 531) (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 530) (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-21 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 529) (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-30 Chapter 3, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2010
2010-07-26 Approved by Governor 7/26/10
2010-07-21 Approved by Governor 7/26/10 - House Journal
2010-07-21 Approved by Governor 7/26/10 - Senate Journal
2010-07-21 To Governor 7/26/10 - Senate Journal
2010-07-21 To Governor 7/26/10 - House Journal
2010-07-26 To Governor 7/26/10
2010-07-21 House received Senate message
2010-07-21 Completed legislative action
2010-07-21 Communicated to House
2010-07-21 Effective from passage (Roll No. 16)
2010-07-21 Passed Senate (Roll No. 16)
2010-07-21 Read 3rd time
2010-07-21 On 3rd reading
2010-07-21 Read 2nd time
2010-07-21 Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 15)
2010-07-21 On 2nd reading
2010-07-21 Read 1st time
2010-07-21 On 1st reading
2010-07-21 Committee reference dispensed
2010-07-21 Immediate consideration
2010-07-21 Introduced in Senate
2010-07-21 Communicated to Senate
2010-07-21 Effective from passage (Roll No. 531)
2010-07-21 Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2010-07-21 Passed House (Roll No. 530)
2010-07-21 Read 3rd time
2010-07-21 Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 529)
2010-07-21 Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2010-07-21 Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2010-07-21 Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2010-07-21 Amendments pending
2010-07-21 Read 2nd time
2010-07-21 On 2nd reading, House Calendar
2010-07-20 Read 1st time
2010-07-20 Immediate consideration
2010-07-20 Do pass
2010-07-20 Originating in House Finance

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback