WV HB2054 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit a landlord to terminate a lease of a portion of a multitenant commercial property if the tenant fails to use the premises for the purpose specified in the lease, and the tenant’s use or nonuse produces an adverse economic effect upon the landlord or another tenant of the property. It establishes a procedure for notifying the tenant and allows the tenant time to commence using the premises for its agreed purpose. It also requires the landlord to notify the tenant of the termination of the lease if the tenant fails to commence using the premises within the specified time. This section is new; therefore, it has been completely underscored.
Title
Relating to the right of the landlord of commercial premises to terminate the lease under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Del. John Shott [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 134) (Y: 70 N: 12 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 133) (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 133) (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 134) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 133) |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-18 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-01-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-14 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |