WV HB2017 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the sheriff serve child abuse and neglect petitions without additional compensation.
Title
Relating to service of process in child abuse cases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2023-01-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-01-31 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-30 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 1/31/23 |
2023-01-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-01-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-26 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-01-20 | House | Committed to Judiciary on 3rd reading |
2023-01-20 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2023-01-19 | House | Amendment pending |
2023-01-19 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 1/20/23 |
2023-01-19 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2023-01-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-01-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-16 | House | Do pass |
2023-01-11 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-11 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 4 | 601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |