WV HB2014 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 225, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 225, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to specify the role of the Legislature in appropriating federal funds and update references to types of federal funds, to recognize that the Legislature is required to appropriate federal funds by the state constitution, to update and clarify statutory cross-references, to limit gubernatorial authority to spend federal funds without appropriation of the Legislature, to limit spending of certain emergency funds for natural disasters without additional enactment, to require reports to the Legislature on proposed and actual spending of those funds, to authorize funds to be reappropriated from one fiscal year to the next, to provide circumstances under which those funds expire to the general revenue fund instead of being reappropriated, to modify certain terms, to update references to public officers, and to prohibit the suspension of any statute governing the appropriation or expenditure of public funds by the exercise of gubernatorial emergency powers.
Title
Relating to role of the Legislature in appropriating federal funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 388) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 387) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 292) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 292) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 291) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 40) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 39) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 387) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 292) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 292) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 291) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 40) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 39) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 225, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Approved by Governor 4/7/21 |
2021-04-08 | House | Approved by Governor 4/7/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/7/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-01 | House | To Governor 4/1/21 |
2021-04-01 | House | To Governor 4/1/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Governor 4/1/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-31 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 388) |
2021-03-31 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 387) |
2021-03-31 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 292) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 292) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 291) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment |
2021-02-22 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-02-22 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-02-19 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 40) |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 39) |
2021-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-18 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2021-02-18 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-10 | House | To House Finance |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-10 | House | To Finance |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11B | 1 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11B | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11B | 2 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11B | 2 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11B | 2 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 3 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 3 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 4 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 11 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 11 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 11 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 11 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 11 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 11 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 11 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 1A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |