WV HB2013 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill relates to requirements for enhanced emergency telephone systems and county emergency dispatch centers The bill requires emergency dispatch centers to develop policies and procedures to establish a protocol for dispatching emergency medical calls .
Title
Requiring the West Virginia Enhanced 911 Council to propose Emergency Medical Dispatch procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-04 - House - Passage (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 64, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/24/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-24 | Approved by Governor 3/24/11 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/24/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/18/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/18/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/18/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-11 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-11 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-11 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-11 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) | |
2011-03-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-11 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-10 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-09 | Reported do pass | |
2011-03-09 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 3/3/11 | |
2011-03-03 | On 2nd reading to Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-03 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-03 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-03 | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | To Government Organization | |
2011-02-07 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-07 | House Message received | |
2011-02-04 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-04 | Passed House (Roll No. 52) | |
2011-02-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-04 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-02-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-03 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-02 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-01-27 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-01-27 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2011-01-12 | To House Political Subdivisions | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced in House | |
2011-01-12 | To Political Subdivisions then Judiciary | |
2011-01-12 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 6 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |