WV HB201 | 2011 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-30 - Chapter 3, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-30 - Chapter 3, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to reapportion the House of Delegates as a result of the 2010 census.
Title
Reapportioning the House of Delegates districts
Sponsors
Del. Brent Boggs [D] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Del. Ronald Fragale [D] | Del. Douglas Reynolds [D] |
Del. Margaret Staggers [D] | Del. Randal Swartzmiller [D] | Del. Harry White [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-21 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-08-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-08-21 - Senate - Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 2) (Y: 9 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-08-21 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 1) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-08-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 559) (Y: 67 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 558) (Y: 51 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 557) (Y: 32 N: 63 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 556) (Y: 15 N: 80 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 555) (Y: 34 N: 61 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 554) (Y: 8 N: 85 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 553) (Y: 9 N: 85 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 552) (Y: 33 N: 62 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 551) (Y: 35 N: 60 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 550) (Y: 44 N: 50 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 549) (Y: 39 N: 56 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 548) (Y: 34 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 547) (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 546) (Y: 31 N: 64 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 545) (Y: 41 N: 55 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-08-21 - Senate - Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 2) (Y: 9 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-08-21 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 1) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-08-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 559) (Y: 67 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 558) (Y: 51 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 557) (Y: 32 N: 63 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 556) (Y: 15 N: 80 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 555) (Y: 34 N: 61 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 554) (Y: 8 N: 85 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 553) (Y: 9 N: 85 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 552) (Y: 33 N: 62 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 551) (Y: 35 N: 60 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 550) (Y: 44 N: 50 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 549) (Y: 39 N: 56 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 548) (Y: 34 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 547) (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 546) (Y: 31 N: 64 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-20 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 545) (Y: 41 N: 55 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-30 | Chapter 3, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2011 | |
2011-08-21 | Approved by Governor 9/2/11 - House Journal | |
2011-09-02 | Approved by Governor 9/2/11 | |
2011-08-21 | Approved by Governor 9/2/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-08-21 | To Governor 8/26/11 - House Journal | |
2011-08-26 | To Governor 8/26/11 | |
2011-08-21 | To Governor 8/26/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-08-21 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-08-21 | House received Senate message | |
2011-08-21 | Communicated to House | |
2011-08-21 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) | |
2011-08-21 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) | |
2011-08-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-08-21 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-08-21 | Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) | |
2011-08-21 | Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) | |
2011-08-21 | Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 2) | |
2011-08-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-08-21 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 1) | |
2011-08-21 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-08-21 | Read 1st time | |
2011-08-21 | On 1st reading | |
2011-08-21 | Committee reference dispensed | |
2011-08-21 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-08-21 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-08-21 | House Message received | |
2011-08-20 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-08-20 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 559) | |
2011-08-20 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-08-20 | Passed House (Roll No. 558) | |
2011-08-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 557) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment ruled not germane | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 556) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 555) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 554) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 553) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 552) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 551) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 550) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 549) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 548) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 547) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 546) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 545) | |
2011-08-20 | Amendment reported by the Clerk | |
2011-08-20 | On 3rd reading with right to amend, House Calendar | |
2011-08-19 | Amendments pending | |
2011-08-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-08-19 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-08-18 | Read 1st time | |
2011-08-18 | Reference dispensed | |
2011-08-18 | Filed for introduction |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |