WV HB2002 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify the law requiring parental notification of abortions performed on unemancipated minors.
Title
Relating to parental notification of abortions performed on unemancipated minors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 541) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 540) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 485) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 484) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 209) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 540) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 485) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 484) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 209) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 541) |
2017-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 540) |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 485) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 484) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2017-04-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-04-06 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 209) |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-20 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-20 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2053 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - To House Health and Human Resources
SB424 (Similar To) 2017-02-23 - To Health and Human Resources
SB424 (Similar To) 2017-02-23 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 2F | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2F | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 2F | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2F | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2F | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2F | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2F | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2F | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2F | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2F | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |