WV HB193 | 2019 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Became law
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to require that the cost of benefits be included in a job posting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a statewide school personnel job bank

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-22 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 907) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 97) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 96) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 882) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-30HouseBecame law
2019-07-24HouseTo Governor 7/24/19
2019-07-23SenateHouse Message received
2019-07-22HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-07-22HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-07-22HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 907)
2019-07-22HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-06-24SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-06-24SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 97)
2019-06-24SenateRead 3rd time
2019-06-24SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-06-24SenateRead 2nd time
2019-06-24SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 96)
2019-06-24SenateRead 1st time
2019-06-24SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2019-06-24SenateImmediate consideration
2019-06-24SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-06-19HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-06-19HousePassed House (Roll No. 882)
2019-06-19HouseRead 3rd time
2019-06-19HouseOn 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
2019-06-18HouseAmendments pending
2019-06-18HouseRead 2nd time
2019-06-18HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-06-17HouseRead 1st time
2019-06-17HouseImmediate consideration
2019-06-17HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-06-17HouseTo House Select Committee on Education Reform D
2019-06-17HouseIntroduced in House
2019-06-17HouseTo Select Committee on Education Reform D
2019-06-17HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18A27aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback