WI SJR9 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: an advisory referendum on an amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Title
An advisory referendum on an amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Representatives Brostoff and Vining added as cosponsors |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senator Schachtner added as a coauthor |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Representative Stuck added as a cosponsor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/joint_resolution/sjr9 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SJR9.pdf |