WI SJR57 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: convention of the States for one or more Constitutional amendments restraining abuses of power by the federal government.
Title
Convention of the States for one or more Constitutional amendments restraining abuses of power by the federal government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Report adoption recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Representative Born added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/joint_resolution/sjr57 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SJR57.pdf |