WI SJR57 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Enrolled on February 24 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - Report correctly enrolled on 2-24-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 24 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - Report correctly enrolled on 2-24-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: stating the legislature's support for farm work.
Title
Stating the legislature's support for farm work.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 2-24-2012 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-02-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-21 | House | Concurred in |
2012-02-16 | House | Placed on calendar 2-21-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-02-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-14-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Introduced |