WI SJR49 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on November 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: the life and public service of Wayne F. Whittow.
Title
The life and public service of Wayne F. Whittow.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-01-27 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as a coauthor |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2012-01-23 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-24-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/joint_resolution/sjr49 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SJR49.pdf |