WI SB978 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (1) (am), 71.05 (1) (an), 71.05 (6) (b) 4. (intro.), 71.05 (6) (b) 54. (intro.) and 71.83 (1) (a) 6.; and to create 71.05 (6) (b) 54m. and 71.05 (6) (b) 54mn. of the statutes; Relating to: increasing and expanding the retirement income subtraction. (FE)
Title
Increasing and expanding the retirement income subtraction. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced |