WI SB92 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 349.025 (1) (b); to renumber and amend 349.01 (2); to amend 349.03 (5) (a); and to create 349.01 (2) (m) and 349.115 of the statutes; Relating to: impoundment of vehicles used in certain reckless driving offenses.
Title
Impoundment of vehicles used in certain reckless driving offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Published 4-4-2023 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 1 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2023 by directive of the Majority Leader |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2023-03-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-03-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 85, Noes 12 |
2023-03-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-03-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Read a second time |
2023-03-22 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2023-03-22 | House | Read |
2023-03-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 1 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senator Hutton added as a coauthor |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senator Testin added as a coauthor |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Nass |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |