WI SB890 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 968.373 (7) (a), 968.373 (7) (b), 968.373 (7) (c) and 968.373 (8) (b) (intro.); and to create 165.25 (21), 968.373 (8) (b) 3. and 968.373 (8s) of the statutes; Relating to: emergency communications device location information.
Title
Emergency communications device location information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator James |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Introduced |