WI SB89 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 36.61 (1) (b), 36.61 (3) (a), 36.61 (5) (b) 1., 36.61 (8) (c) 3., 146.81 (1) (c), 146.89 (1) (r) 1., 146.89 (1) (r) 5., 146.89 (3) (b) 8., 146.89 (3m) (intro.), 146.997 (1) (d) 3., 155.01 (7), 252.14 (1) (ar) 3., 257.01 (5) (a), 257.01 (5) (b), 447.02 (1) (a), 447.02 (1) (b), 447.02 (2) (a), 447.02 (3) (a) (intro.), 447.02 (3) (a) 2., 447.02 (3) (b), 447.02 (5), 447.03 (3) (c), 447.05, 447.06 (1), 447.06 (2) (a) 3., 447.06 (2) (b), 447.06 (2) (c) (intro.), 447.06 (2) (c) 2. (intro.), 447.065, 447.07 (1), 447.07 (3) (intro.), 447.07 (3) (e) to (h), 447.40 (intro.), 447.40 (6), 448.03 (2) (a), 448.21 (1) (a), 450.03 (1) (e), 450.10 (3) (a) 4., 462.02 (2) (d), 462.04, 463.10 (5), 463.12 (5), 632.87 (4), 895.48 (1m) (a) (intro.), 895.48 (1m) (a) 2. and 941.315 (5); and to create 15.405 (6) (am), 36.61 (1) (ak), 440.03 (13) (b) 20m., 440.08 (2) (a) 25m., 447.01 (6g), 447.01 (6r), 447.02 (1) (g), 447.03 (1m), 447.03 (3) (am), 447.04 (1m), 447.057, 447.06 (1m) and 447.06 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: licensure of dental therapists; extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensure of dental therapists; extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2019-10-08SenateRepresentative Wittke withdrawn as a cosponsor
2019-08-21SenatePublic hearing held
2019-03-25SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-07SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback