WI SB857 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 165.845 (1r) (a) 3., 165.845 (1r) (e) and 758.19 (8) of the statutes; Relating to: Department of Justice collection of data on the use of appearance bonds and cash in lieu of appearance bonds. (FE)
Title
Department of Justice collection of data on the use of appearance bonds and cash in lieu of appearance bonds. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 24, Noes 9 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bradley |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced |