WI SB836 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 165.70 (1) (f) and 192.49 of the statutes; Relating to: complaints against railroad police officers. (FE)
Title
Complaints against railroad police officers. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb836 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB836.pdf |