WI SB795 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 102.475 (1), 230.45 (1) (d), 321.65 (3) (a) (intro.), 321.65 (3) (a) 1., 321.65 (3) (a) 4. and 321.65 (3) (f) 1.; and to create 20.465 (1) (dm), 321.67 and 321.68 of the statutes; Relating to: reemployment rights, death benefits, and continuation pay benefits of national guard and state defense force members on state active duty and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Reemployment rights, death benefits, and continuation pay benefits of national guard and state defense force members on state active duty and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Military Affairs and Senior Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development, Military Affairs and Senior Issues |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb795 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB795.pdf |