WI SB783 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 77.99, 77.995 (2), 344.57 (5), 344.57 (6) and 344.57 (7); and to create 344.51 (4), 344.581 and 632.362 of the statutes; Relating to: requirements for and insurance related to peer-to-peer motor vehicle sharing programs. (FE)
Title
Requirements for and insurance related to peer-to-peer motor vehicle sharing programs. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Introduced |