WI SB782 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.435 (1) (ck) and 256.158 of the statutes; Relating to: epinephrine for ambulances and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Epinephrine for ambulances and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-12-22 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Introduced |