WI SB775 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.370 (4) (ba), 20.370 (4) (bb), 20.370 (4) (bc), 20.370 (6) (ac) and 281.185 of the statutes; Relating to: providing positions and funding related to PFAS management zones, creating a municipal grant program for PFAS testing, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Providing positions and funding related to PFAS management zones, creating a municipal grant program for PFAS testing, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] |
Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Representative Swearingen added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb775 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB775.pdf |