WI SB759 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 255.07 (2); to amend 118.292 (title), 118.292 (1r) (intro.) and (a) and (2) (a) and (b), 118.2925 (title), 118.2925 (1) (a), 118.2925 (1) (h), 118.2925 (3), 118.2925 (4) (title), (a), (b) and (c), 118.2925 (4m) (a) and (b), 118.2925 (5), 255.07 (title) and (1) (a), 255.07 (3), 255.07 (4), 255.07 (5) (a) 2. and 3., 255.07 (6) (a) (intro.), 1., 2. and 3., (b), (d), (e) and (f), 448.03 (2) (q) and 450.11 (4) (a) 5. d.; and to create 118.292 (1g) (bm), 118.2925 (1) (fm), 255.07 (1) (e) and 255.07 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: use of epinephrine prefilled syringes and standing order for epinephrine. (FE)
Title
Use of epinephrine prefilled syringes and standing order for epinephrine. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Janis Ringhand [D] | Rep. Shae Sortwell [R] | Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] |
Rep. Katrina Shankland [D] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb759 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB759.pdf |