WI SB722 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 809.30 (2) (d), 885.10, 938.32 (5) (title), 977.02 (3) (intro.), 977.05 (4) (g), 977.05 (4) (gm), 977.05 (4) (h), 977.06 (1) (d), 977.06 (2) (a), 977.06 (2) (am), 977.07 (1) (a), 977.07 (1) (c) and 977.07 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: the determination of indigency prior to the state public defender appointing an attorney to represent a parent in a proceeding under chapters 48 and 938, the description of defendant indigency for public defender fees, and recusal from juvenile justice proceedings (suggested as remedial legislation by the State Public Defender). (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The determination of indigency prior to the state public defender appointing an attorney to represent a parent in a proceeding under chapters 48 and 938, the description of defendant indigency for public defender fees, and recusal from juvenile justice proceedings (suggested as remedial legislation by the State Public Defender). (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-02-09SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-02-01SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-01-31SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-01-19SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-01-19SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback