WI SB706 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Passed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Published 2-1-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Passed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Published 2-1-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 39.465 (title), 39.465 (1) (a), 39.465 (1) (d), 39.465 (2), 39.465 (3) (a), 39.465 (3) (b) and 39.465 (4); and to create 39.465 (1) (b) and 39.465 (1) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: scholarships for Marquette University School of Dentistry students who practice in dental health shortage areas. (FE)
Title
Scholarships for Marquette University School of Dentistry students who practice in dental health shortage areas. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Published 2-1-2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 1-31-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 90 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 1-29-2024 |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-01-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-01-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-01-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-01-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-18 | House | Read a second time |
2024-01-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2024-01-16 | House | Read |
2024-01-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 1 |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-12-15 | Senate | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-29 | Senate | Representative Green added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Introduced |