WI SB698 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.1105 (6) (am) 2. n. of the statutes; Relating to: extending the expenditure period for a tax incremental district in the city of Westby. (FE)
Title
Extending the expenditure period for a tax incremental district in the city of Westby. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Introduced |