WI SB665 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: emergency medical services funding assistance and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Emergency medical services funding assistance and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Health and Human Services and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb665 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB665.pdf |