WI SB657 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 40.65 (3); to amend 40.65 (4) (intro.), 40.65 (4) (a) and 40.65 (4) (b); to repeal and recreate 40.65 (4) (c); and to create 40.65 (3) (b), 40.65 (3) (c), 40.65 (4d), 111.70 (4) (mc) 1. and 111.91 (2) (hm) of the statutes; Relating to: the duty disability benefit program under the Wisconsin Retirement System, prohibited subjects of collective bargaining under the Municipal Employment Relations Act and the State Employment Labor Relations Act, and requiring the Legislative Audit Bureau to conduct a program evaluation audit of certain disability and survivor benefit programs of public employee retirement systems in this state. (FE)
Title
The duty disability benefit program under the Wisconsin Retirement System, prohibited subjects of collective bargaining under the Municipal Employment Relations Act and the State Employment Labor Relations Act, and requiring the Legislative Audit Bureau to conduct a program evaluation audit of certain disability and survivor benefit programs of public employee retirement systems in this state. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Grothman |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb657 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB657.pdf |