WI SB636 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 340.01 (32) (a) (intro.); to renumber 340.01 (32) (a) 1., 340.01 (32) (a) 2. and 340.01 (32) (b); to renumber and amend 990.01 (43m); to amend 20.395 (5) (dr), 20.395 (5) (eh), 85.30, 340.01 (29m) (am) 2., 340.01 (32) (intro.), 340.01 (38m) (a) 1., 341.10 (6), 343.03 (3) (a), 343.04 (1) (e), 343.05 (3) (b), 343.07 (1g) (intro.), 343.07 (4) (title) and (a), 343.07 (4) (b), 343.08 (1) (a), 343.08 (2) (a), 343.16 (1) (d) 1., 343.16 (2) (b), 343.17 (3) (c) 5., 343.32 (4), 346.54 (1) (cm), 346.595 (1), 346.595 (3), 346.595 (3m), 347.09 (1) (b), 347.15 (1), 347.35 (1a), 347.42, 347.485 (title) and (1), 347.485 (2) (c), 347.485 (3), 347.485 (4), 347.486 (1), 347.486 (2), 347.487 and 990.01 (43r); and to create 340.01 (3m) and 341.25 (1) (bg) of the statutes; Relating to: registration and operation of vehicles defined as autocycles. (FE)
Title
Registration and operation of vehicles defined as autocycles. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senator Schachtner added as a coauthor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Representative Quinn added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Erpenbach added as a coauthor |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb636 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB636.pdf |