WI SB631 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-13)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-13)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 30.2065 (1) and 30.2065 (2) (title); to renumber and amend 30.2065 (2); and to create 15.347 (23) and 30.2065 (1g) of the statutes; Relating to: a general permit for hydrologic restoration projects and creating a hydrologic restoration and management advisory council.
Title
A general permit for hydrologic restoration projects and creating a hydrologic restoration and management advisory council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Cowles and Bewley |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb631 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB631.pdf |