WI SB620 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Introduced on October 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-04 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 29.596; to amend 20.370 (1) (hy), 29.179 (4), 29.563 (14) (c) 3., 29.563 (14) (c) 4., 29.889 (1) (e), 29.938 (intro.), 29.977 (1) (b) and 29.983 (1) (b) 2.; and to create 20.370 (1) (hy), 29.165, 29.180 (1) (a) 8m., 29.183 (1) (hm), 29.553 (1) (gm), 29.563 (2) (c) 3., 29.563 (2) (d) 3., 29.563 (13) (am), 29.563 (14) (a) 4. and 29.596 of the statutes; Relating to: hunting of sandhill cranes, wildlife damage abatement assistance and claim payments for damage caused by sandhill cranes, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting of sandhill cranes, wildlife damage abatement assistance and claim payments for damage caused by sandhill cranes, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-04SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-10-21SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-10-21SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-10-21SenateExecutive action taken
2021-10-19SenatePublic hearing held
2021-10-14SenateRepresentative Thiesfeldt added as a cosponsor
2021-10-14SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues
2021-10-14SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback