WI SB598 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 115.415 (3) (a) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: utilizing an alternative process for educator effectiveness.
Title
Utilizing an alternative process for educator effectiveness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 55 N: 36 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 55 N: 36 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Published 4-9-2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 258 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 91, Noes 0 |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 54, Noes 37 |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Pope and Clark |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 55, Noes 36 |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Pope, Wright, Clark and Hesselbein |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steineke |
2014-03-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:48 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2014-03-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Olsen |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced |