WI SB588 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.11 (3) (d) (intro.), 36.11 (47m) (title) and 38.12 (12) (title); and to create 36.11 (47m) (c) and 38.12 (12) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: exempting veterans and members of the armed forces from admissions application fees at University of Wisconsin System schools and technical colleges. (FE)
Title
Exempting veterans and members of the armed forces from admissions application fees at University of Wisconsin System schools and technical colleges. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb588 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB588.pdf |