WI SB586 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: allocation of federal American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 funds for repairs to Potawatomi State Park observation tower. (FE)
Title
Allocation of federal American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 funds for repairs to Potawatomi State Park observation tower. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] | Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] |
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. William Penterman [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Representative Dittrich added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Introduced |