WI SB586 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 767.451 (5m) (c); to renumber 767.41 (5) (c); to amend 767.41 (2) (e) 1. and 767.451 (5m) (a); and to create 767.41 (5) (c) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: legal custody and physical placement factors for a child of a service member.
Title
Legal custody and physical placement factors for a child of a service member.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Representative Plumer added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb586 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB586.pdf |