WI SB553 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 40.04 (3) (ab) and 40.21 (1m); to amend 40.02 (48m) (e), 40.04 (3) (intro.), 40.21 (1), 40.23 (1) (a) 1., 40.23 (1) (d), 40.26 (2) (b), 40.26 (2) (c) and 40.26 (3); and to create 40.03 (2) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: remedial legislation affecting the Wisconsin Retirement System and the Department of Employee Trust Funds (suggested as remedial legislation by the Department of Employee Trust Funds). (FE)
Title
Remedial legislation affecting the Wisconsin Retirement System and the Department of Employee Trust Funds (suggested as remedial legislation by the Department of Employee Trust Funds). (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb553 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB553.pdf |