WI SB550 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 703.275 (5) and 703.28 (1m) (a); to renumber 703.13 (7) (a) and 703.275 (1) (title); to renumber and amend 703.095, 703.11 (2) (b), 703.13 (6) (c), 703.26 (2) (b), 703.275 (1) and 703.28 (1m) (b); to consolidate, renumber and amend 703.08 (2) (intro.), (a) and (b); to amend 703.02 (1b), 703.02 (1h), 703.02 (3), 703.02 (6m), 703.02 (14g), 703.07 (2), 703.09 (2), 703.09 (4), 703.093 (1), 703.093 (7), 703.10 (5), 703.11 (2) (d), 703.11 (5), 703.115 (1) (a), 703.115 (1) (b), 703.12, 703.13 (4), 703.13 (6) (d), 703.13 (6) (e), 703.13 (6) (f), 703.13 (7) (b), 703.13 (7) (c), 703.13 (7) (d), 703.13 (8) (b), 703.13 (8) (c), 703.163 (11), 703.165 (3), 703.19 (5), 703.26 (2) (intro.), 703.26 (2) (a), 703.26 (2) (c), 703.26 (2) (d), 703.26 (3), 703.265 (3), 703.30 (2), 703.365 (3m) and 706.01 (7r) (b); and to create 703.02 (3m), 703.02 (8m), 703.065, 703.09 (1) (title), 703.09 (1b), 703.09 (1c) (title), 703.09 (2m) (title), 703.09 (3) (title), 703.095 (2) (d), 703.095 (3), 703.11 (2) (b) 3., 703.13 (7) (ac), 703.26 (3) (d), 703.275 (1c) and 703.275 (1m) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: requirements related to condominium documents and technical changes to condominium law.
Title
Requirements related to condominium documents and technical changes to condominium law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb550 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB550.pdf |