WI SB542 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 108.24 (1); and to create 108.24 (1) (b) and (c) of the statutes; Relating to: criminal penalties for fraud in obtaining unemployment insurance benefits and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Criminal penalties for fraud in obtaining unemployment insurance benefits and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Kapenga [R] | Sen. David Craig [R] | Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] |
Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Adam Neylon [R] | Sen. Rob Hutton [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Vinehout |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb542 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB542.pdf |