WI SB532 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 48.58 (1); to renumber and amend 48.63 (1); to amend 48.028 (5) (a), 48.38 (2) (d), 48.38 (4) (d) 1., 48.57 (3n) (am) 6. c., 48.615 (1) (b), 48.64 (1), 48.64 (1m), 48.64 (1r), 48.64 (2), 48.979 (1) (c), 48.979 (2), 253.10 (3) (c) 2. c., 938.22 (2) (c) and 938.38 (2) (d); and to create 48.58 (5) and 48.63 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: placement of a child in a shelter care facility under a voluntary agreement. (FE)
Title
Placement of a child in a shelter care facility under a voluntary agreement. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Farrow |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb532 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB532.pdf |