WI SB527 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 895.527 (3) and 895.527 (4); and to create 895.527 (8), 895.527 (9) and 895.527 (10) of the statutes; Relating to: liability and immunity of sport shooting ranges.
Title
Liability and immunity of sport shooting ranges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Published 4-9-2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 202 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 65, Noes 30 |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Refused to table Senate Amendment 3 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 laid on table |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Grothman and S. Fitzgerald |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Risser, Harris, T. Cullen, Miller, Carpenter and C. Larson |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 3, Noes 1 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced |