WI SB501 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 348.27 (11m) (a); to amend 348.27 (11m) (b); and to create 348.01 (2) (bu) and 348.27 (11m) (a) 1. and 2. of the statutes; Relating to: agricultural emergency permits issued by the Department of Transportation for vehicles transporting oversize loads. (FE)
Title
Agricultural emergency permits issued by the Department of Transportation for vehicles transporting oversize loads. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Sheila Harsdorf [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. John Murtha [R] |
Rep. Keith Ripp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Published 4-9-2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 216 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Wright added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-02-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |