WI SB492 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 950.04 (1v) (df), 971.313 and 974.05 (1) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: obtaining crime victim mental health treatment records. (FE)
Title
Obtaining crime victim mental health treatment records. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2017-11-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb492 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB492.pdf |