WI SB475 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-10)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-10)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 46.536 of the statutes; Relating to: crisis program enhancement grants. (FE)
Title
Crisis program enhancement grants. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Introduced |