WI SB465 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 256.35 (3s) (d) 4.; and to create 256.35 (3s) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: grants for Next Generation 911 and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Grants for Next Generation 911 and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Representative Born added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb465 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB465.pdf |