WI SB452 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-9)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-9)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 125.07 (3) (a) 16. of the statutes; Relating to: creating an exception to the prohibition against underage persons entering or being on premises operating under a retail alcohol beverage license.
Title
Creating an exception to the prohibition against underage persons entering or being on premises operating under a retail alcohol beverage license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Published 4-9-2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 249 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-12-23 | Senate | Representative Bewley added as a cosponsor |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Local Government |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Introduced |